Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Avery Robert Cardinal Dulles, S.J. †

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of Santissimi Nome di Gesł e Maria in Via Lata

Priest of Society of Jesus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Aug 1918Born
16 Jun 195637.8Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
21 Feb 200182.4Elevated to Cardinal
21 Feb 200182.4AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santissimi Nome di Gesł e Maria in Via Lata
23 Feb 200182.4InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santissimi Nome di Gesł e Maria in Via Lata
12 Dec 200890.3DiedPriest of Society of Jesus

MicroData Summary for Avery Robert Dulles (VIAF: 10251)
Avery Robert Cardinal Dulles S.J. (born , died ) Cardinal-Deacon of Santissimi Nome di Gesł e Maria in Via Lata

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAuburn, NY, USA

  • a priest for 52.4 years
  • a cardinal for 7.8 years

Source(s):
  • i: Bollettino, 22 Feb 2001
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Necrology (back)
  • c1: CB, 23 Feb 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018