Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles-Auguste de Sales

Deceased

Bishop of Genève {Geneva}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1606BornThorens
19 Dec 164438.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Genève {Geneva}, Switzerland
19 Dec 164438.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Hebron
14 May 164539.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hebron
3 Nov 164539.8SucceededBishop of Genève {Geneva}, Switzerland
8 Feb 166054.1DiedBishop of Genève {Geneva}, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Charles-Auguste de Sales:
Bishop Charles-Auguste de Sales (born , died ) Bishop of Genève {Geneva}

  • a bishop for 14.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 193
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1645, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 22 Mar 2015