Catholic-Hierarchy DC

St. Galdino Cardinal della Sala

Deceased

Archbishop of Milano {Milan}

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Sabina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1096¹BornMilan
15 Dec 116569.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Sabina
15 Dec 116569.9Elevated to Cardinal
27 Mar 116670.2AppointedArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
18 Apr 116670.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
18 Apr 117680.2DiedArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for St. Galdino della Sala:
St. Galdino Cardinal della Sala (died ) Archbishop of Milano {Milan}

  • a bishop for 10.0 years
  • a cardinal for 10.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: CB, 30 Dec 2013
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Number 17,888

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015