Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Francesco della Rovere

Deceased

Bishop of Torino, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
10 May 1504AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Torino, Italy
Aug 1510³SucceededBishop of Torino, Italy
28 Mar 1512Ordained BishopBishop of Torino, Italy
21 May 1515AppointedArchbishop of Torino {Turin}, Italy
1517¹DiedArchbishop of Torino {Turin}, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Francesco della Rovere
Bishop Giovanni Francesco della Rovere (died 1517) Bishop of Torino

EventPlace
Ordained BishopCastel Sant’Angelo, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 4.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 309
  • ob: CB, 26 Nov 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018