Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gioia Dragomani

Deceased

Bishop of Pienza


Events

DateEventTitle
27 Nov 1592AppointedBishop of Montepeloso, Italy
1596¹ResignedBishop of Montepeloso, Italy
15 Dec 1599AppointedBishop of Pienza, Italy
26 Dec 1630DiedBishop of Pienza, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gioia Dragomani:
Bishop Gioia Dragomani (died ) Bishop of Pienza

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 247, and Page 280
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 249

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015