Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan de Quevedo Villegas, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Bishop of Santa María de La Antigua del Darién, Panama


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1450¹Born
9 Sep 151363.6AppointedBishop of Santa María de La Antigua del Darién, Panama
29 Jan 151464.0Ordained BishopBishop of Santa María de La Antigua del Darién, Panama
30 Jul 151464.5InstalledBishop of Santa María de La Antigua del Darién, Panama
24 Dec 151969.9DiedBishop of Santa María de La Antigua del Darién, Panama

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan de Quevedo Villegas
Bishop Juan de Quevedo Villegas O.F.M. Obs. (born 1450, died ) Bishop of Santa María de La Antigua del Darién

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVéjoris, Diocese of Burgos, Spain
Ordained BishopSeville, Archdiocese of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
Death PlaceBarcelona, Diocese of Barcelona, Spain

  • a bishop for 5.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 29, Number 105
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 268
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1514, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 26 May 2018

Quantcast