Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Cosimo de’ Pazzi

Deceased

Archbishop of Firenze {Florence}, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Dec 1466Born
10 Dec 149226.0AppointedBishop of Oloron (Oloron-Sainte-Marie), France
17 Apr 149730.3AppointedBishop of Arezzo, Italy
5 Jul 150841.5AppointedArchbishop of Firenze {Florence}, Italy
8 Apr 151346.3DiedArchbishop of Firenze {Florence}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Cosimo de’ Pazzi
Archbishop Cosimo de’ Pazzi (born , died ) Archbishop of Firenze {Florence}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFirenze

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 207

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast