Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Maurice Donnellan

Deceased

Bishop of Clonfert, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1635¹Born
31 Jan 169358.0SelectedBishop of Clonfert, Ireland
14 Nov 169560.8ConfirmedBishop of Clonfert, Ireland
13 Jul 170671.5DiedBishop of Clonfert, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Maurice Donnellan
Bishop Maurice Donnellan (born 1635, died ) Bishop of Clonfert

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBallydonnellan, Co. Galway

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 162
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1696, Number 45
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast