Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Marc’Antonio de Dominis

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Split (Spalato), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1560¹Born
13 Aug 160040.6AppointedBishop of Senj, Croatia
15 Nov 160242.8AppointedArchbishop of Split (Spalato), Croatia
1616¹56.0ResignedArchbishop of Split (Spalato), Croatia
9 Sep 162464.6DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Split (Spalato), Croatia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Marc’Antonio de Dominis (VIAF: 68963611)
Archbishop Marc’Antonio de Dominis (born 1560, died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Split (Spalato)

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 320, and Page 309
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1600, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast