Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Cardinal Dominici, O.P. †

Deceased

Administrator of Bova, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of San Sisto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1356¹Born
1372²16.0ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
1380²24.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
26 Mar 140852.2AppointedArchbishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia
9 May 140852.3Elevated to Cardinal
9 May 140852.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Sisto
1409¹53.0ResignedArchbishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia
16 May 141054.3AppointedAdministrator of Tropea, Italy
17 Sep 141054.7ResignedAdministrator of Tropea, Italy
2 Mar 141256.1AppointedAdministrator of Melfi, Italy
21 Apr 141256.3AppointedAdministrator of Bova, Italy
10 Jun 141963.4DiedAdministrator of Bova, Italy
May 1622³Beatified

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Dominici
Giovanni Cardinal Dominici O.P. (born 1356, died ) Administrator of Bova

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFlorence

  • a priest for 39.4 years
  • a cardinal for 11.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 9 May 1408

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast