Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tommaso de Nigris

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Trogir (Tra¨), Croatia


Events

DateEventTitle
11 Jan 1520AppointedBishop of Scardona (Skradin), Italy
17 Jan 1520Ordained BishopBishop of Scardona (Skradin), Italy
2 Sep 1524AppointedBishop of Trogir (Tra¨), Croatia
1525¹ResignedBishop of Trogir (Tra¨), Croatia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tommaso de Nigris
Bishop Tommaso de Nigris , Bishop Emeritus of Trogir (Tra¨)

EventPlace
Ordained BishopChapel of the Consecrator, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 316, and Page 294
  • b/c23: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1520, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 5 Jun 2018

Quantcast