Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis du Moulinet

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Sées {Séez}, France


Events

DateEventTitle
17 Nov 1564AppointedBishop of Sées {Séez}, France
24 Apr 1565Ordained BishopBishop of Sées {Séez}, France
23 Oct 1600ResignedBishop of Sées {Séez}, France
3 Mar 1601DiedBishop Emeritus of Sées {Séez}, France

MicroData Summary for Louis du Moulinet
Bishop Louis du Moulinet (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Sées {Séez}

  • a bishop for 35.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: La France Pontificale, Volume 14, Page 52
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1565, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast