Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio de Morales, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Concepción


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1612¹BornLima, Peru
8 Dec 168169.9SelectedBishop of Concepción, Chile
25 May 168270.3ConfirmedBishop of Concepción, Chile
21 Nov 168371.8Ordained BishopBishop of Concepción, Chile
Dec 1683³71.9DiedBishop-Elect of Concepción, Chile

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio de Morales:
Bishop Antonio de Morales O.P. (born 1612, died Dec 1683) Bishop of Concepción

  • a bishop for -.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: JPG
  • c2: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 167
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1683, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 21 Apr 2015