Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guy Mone (de Mona)

Deceased

Bishop of Saint David’s, Wales


Events

DateEventTitle
30 Aug 1397AppointedBishop of Saint David’s, Wales, Great Britain
11 Nov 1397Ordained BishopBishop of Saint David’s, Wales, Great Britain
8 Sep 1398InstalledBishop of Saint David’s, Wales, Great Britain
31 Aug 1407DiedBishop of Saint David’s, Wales, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Guy Mone (de Mona)
Bishop Guy Mone (de Mona) (died ) Bishop of Saint David’s

  • a bishop for 9.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 295
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 336
  • ob: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 83
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 108, Number 9,448
  • c2+: CB, 13 Feb 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 13 Feb 2016