Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco della Marra

Deceased

Bishop of Mottola (Motula), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Mar 1647³Born
8 Sep 167023.4Ordained PriestPriest
17 Oct 169548.5SelectedBishop of Mottola (Motula), Italy
2 Apr 169649.0ConfirmedBishop of Mottola (Motula), Italy
8 Apr 169649.0Ordained BishopBishop of Mottola (Motula), Italy
Aug 1696³49.3DiedBishop of Mottola (Motula), Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco della Marra
Bishop Francesco della Marra (born , died Aug 1696) Bishop of Mottola (Motula)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGuardia

  • a priest for 25.8 years
  • a bishop for .3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 276
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1696, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast