Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gabriele Maria de Marchis

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Tiberiopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Mar 1775BornLungro, Italy
7 Jul 179924.3Ordained PriestPriest
23 Jun 183459.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Tiberiopolis
Jul 1834³59.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tiberiopolis
18 Apr 185883.1DiedTitular Bishop of Tiberiopolis

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gabriele Maria de Marchis
Bishop Gabriele Maria de Marchis (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Tiberiopolis

  • a priest for 58.7 years
  • a bishop for 23.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 369
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1834, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 11 Aug 2016