Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François de La Tour

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Quimper


Events

DateEventTitle
26 Aug 1573AppointedBishop of Quimper, France
20 Dec 1573Ordained BishopBishop of Quimper, France
14 Oct 1583AppointedBishop of Tréguier, France
1587²ResignedBishop of Tréguier, France
1593²DiedBishop Emeritus of Tréguier, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for François de La Tour:
Bishop François de La Tour Bishop Emeritus of Quimper

  • a bishop for 19.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 179, and Page 317
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 209, Number 17,202

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013