Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[ROC Father Paul Marie Stefan de Djunkowsky] †

Russian Orthodox

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Arctic Pole

Titular See: (left the Church)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Feb 1821Born
1842²20.8Converted
1842²20.8EnteredMember of Society of Jesus
1847²25.8Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
1853²31.8IncardinatedPriest
3 Dec 185534.7AppointedPrefect of Arctic Pole
Oct 1861²40.6ResignedPrefect of Arctic Pole
10 Mar 187049.0DiedPrefect Emeritus of Arctic Pole

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paul Marie Stefan de Djunkowsky
Father Paul Marie Stefan de Djunkowsky (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Arctic Pole

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSt. Petersburg, Archdiocese of Mohilev, Belarus
Death PlaceSt. Petersburg, Archdiocese of Mohilev, Belarus

  • a priest for 23.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 1 Oct 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast