Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Ignace Michel III Djarwé (Jarweh)

Deceased

Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Syrian)

Bishop of Beirut {Bairut} (Syrian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1731¹Born
23 Feb 176635.1Ordained BishopBishop
10 Dec 177443.9Converted
19 Jul 178049.5AppointedBishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Syrian), Syria
15 Dec 178352.9AppointedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Syrian), Lebanon
15 Dec 178352.9AppointedBishop of Beirut {Bairut} (Syrian), Lebanon
4 Sep 180069.6DiedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Syrian), Lebanon

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ignace Michel III Djarwé (Jarweh):
Patriarch Ignace Michel III Djarwé (Jarweh) (born 1731, died ) Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}

  • a bishop for 34.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 74, and Page 88
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1766, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 7 Dec 2015