Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alexander Dirre

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Olomouc (Olmütz)

Titular Bishop of Nicopolis in Armenia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Nov 1610BornOlomouc
10 Jun 163423.5Ordained PriestPriest of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic
11 Jun 166857.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic
11 Jun 166857.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Nicopolis in Armenia
16 Aug 166857.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nicopolis in Armenia
21 Nov 166959.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Alexander Dirre:
Bishop Alexander Dirre (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Olomouc (Olmütz)

  • a priest for 35.4 years
  • a bishop for 1.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 288
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1668, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015