Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Beatus di Porta

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Chur, Switzerland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1530¹Born
24 Aug 156535.6AppointedBishop of Chur, Switzerland
11 Nov 156535.8Ordained BishopBishop of Chur, Switzerland
1581¹51.0ResignedBishop of Chur, Switzerland
1590²60.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Chur, Switzerland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Beatus di Porta (VIAF: 299641379)
Bishop Beatus di Porta (born 1530, died 1590) Bishop Emeritus of Chur

EventPlace
Ordained BishopPauline, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 24.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 183
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 7, Number 4
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1565, Number 19
  • ob: CB, 28 Oct 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast