Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Antonio Díez Merino, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Menorca, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jun 1772Born
26 Mar 183158.7SelectedBishop of Menorca, Spain
30 Sep 183159.2ConfirmedBishop of Menorca, Spain
1 Jan 183259.5Ordained BishopBishop of Menorca, Spain
16 Apr 184471.8DiedBishop of Menorca, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan Antonio Díez Merino
Bishop Juan Antonio Díez Merino O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Menorca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIniesta

  • a bishop for 12.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 267
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 148, Number 805
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1832, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast