Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Paulino Díaz Rodriguez, O.E.S.A. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of San León del Amazonas, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 May 1850Born
1 Oct 186717.4ProfessedMember of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
7 Jun 187323.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
19 Jun 190050.1AppointedPrefect of San León del Amazonas, Peru
24 Oct 191161.4ResignedPrefect of San León del Amazonas, Peru
8 May 191969.0DiedPrefect Emeritus of San León del Amazonas, Peru

MicroData Summary for Paulino Díaz Rodriguez
Father Paulino Díaz Rodriguez O.E.S.A. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of San León del Amazonas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTolivia, Spain

  • a priest for 45.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 15 Jul 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast