Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Louis d’Harcourt

Deceased

Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine

Bishop of Bayeux


Events

DateEventTitle
27 Oct 1451AppointedBishop of Béziers, France
10 Dec 1451AppointedArchbishop of Narbonne, France
18 Jan 1460AppointedTitular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine
18 Jan 1460AppointedBishop of Bayeux, France
14 Dec 1479DiedTitular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine

MicroData Summary for Louis d’Harcourt
Patriarch Louis d’Harcourt (died ) Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 199, and Page 107
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 164, and Page 101
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,451, Number 33*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast