Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Paolo Cardinal Dezza, S.J. †

Deceased

Priest of Society of Jesus

Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Ignazio di Loyola a Campo Marzio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Dec 1901Born
2 Dec 191816.9EnteredMember of Society of Jesus
25 Mar 192826.2Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
28 Jun 199189.5Elevated to Cardinal
28 Jun 199189.5AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Ignazio di Loyola a Campo Marzio
17 Dec 199998.0DiedPriest of Society of Jesus

MicroData Summary for Paolo Dezza (VIAF: 212429449)
Paolo Cardinal Dezza S.J. (born , died ) Priest of Society of Jesus

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParma, Diocese of Parma (-Fontevivo), Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Society of Jesus mausoleum, Campo Verano, Cemetery, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Current)S. Ignazio di Loyola a Campo Marzio, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 71.7 years
  • a cardinal for 8.4 years

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 157, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Necrology (back)
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 5 Jun 2017