Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean (Michel) d’Estress

Deceased

Bishop of Lectoure, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jul 1582Born
3 Aug 160927.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Lectoure, France
3 Aug 160927.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Laodicea in Syria
4 Oct 160927.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Laodicea in Syria
24 Mar 163552.7SucceededBishop of Lectoure, France
12 Apr 164663.7DiedBishop of Lectoure, France

MicroData Summary for Jean (Michel) d’Estress
Bishop Jean (Michel) d’Estress (born , died ) Bishop of Lectoure

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAstaillac

  • a bishop for 36.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 218
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1609, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast