Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francisco Cardinal Desprats

Deceased

Bishop of León, Spain

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Sergio e Bacco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1454¹Born
14 Feb 149844.1SelectedBishop of Catania, Italy
20 Mar 149844.2ConfirmedBishop of Catania, Italy
9 Feb 150046.1AppointedBishop of Astorga, Spain
4 Dec 150046.9AppointedBishop of León, Spain
5 Feb 150147.0InstalledBishop of León, Spain
31 May 150349.4Elevated to Cardinal
12 Jun 150349.4InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Sergio e Bacco
10 Sep 150450.6DiedBishop of León, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Desprats (VIAF: 89551270)
Francisco Cardinal Desprats (born 1454, died ) Bishop of León

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOrihuela
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)S. Salvatore in Lauro, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 1.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 31 May 1503
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1498, Number 19*
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 122, and Page 98
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 174

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 7 Jan 2019

Quantcast