Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Ausias Cardinal Despuig

Deceased

Archbishop of Monreale, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Sabina

Bishop of Capaccio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1423²Born
Jul 1458³35.5SelectedArchbishop of Monreale, Italy
18 Sep 145835.7ConfirmedArchbishop of Monreale, Italy
7 May 147350.3Elevated to Cardinal
17 May 147350.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Vitale
15 Dec 147552.9AppointedAdministrator of Zaragoza, Spain
9 Aug 147653.6AppointedBishop of Capaccio, Italy
12 Dec 147754.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Sabina
14 Aug 147855.6ResignedAdministrator of Zaragoza, Spain
2 Sep 148360.6DiedArchbishop of Monreale, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ausias Despuig (VIAF: 33063934)
Ausias Cardinal Despuig (born 1423, died ) Archbishop of Monreale

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJátiva, Diocese of Valencia, Spain
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a cardinal for 10.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 7 May 1473
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 196
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1458, Number 33*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 27 Aug 2018

Quantcast