Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francesco della Rovere

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Benevento, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
1505²AppointedBishop of Mileto, Italy
23 Feb 1508AppointedBishop of Camerino, Italy
Jul 1509³AppointedBishop of Vicenza, Italy
12 Jun 1514AppointedBishop of Volterra, Italy
12 Jan 1530AppointedArchbishop of Benevento, Italy
2 Apr 1544ResignedArchbishop of Benevento, Italy
1545²DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Benevento, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco della Rovere
Archbishop Francesco della Rovere (died 1545) Archbishop Emeritus of Benevento

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 333, and Page 244
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 149, and Page 132
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 337

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast