Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Henri-Marie Cardinal de Lubac, S.J. †

Deceased

Priest of Society of Jesus

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Domnica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Feb 1896BornCambrai, France
22 Aug 192731.5Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
2 Feb 198387.0Elevated to Cardinal
2 Feb 198387.0AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Domnica
4 Sep 199195.5DiedPriest of Society of Jesus

MicroData Summary for Henri-Marie de Lubac:
Cardinal Henri-Marie de Lubac S.J. (born , died ) Priest of Society of Jesus

  • a priest for 64.0 years
  • a cardinal for 8.6 years

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013