Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Ardicino Cardinal della Porta (Sr.)

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of Santi Cosma e Damiano


Events

DateEventTitle
24 May 1426Elevated to Cardinal
27 May 1426AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santi Cosma e Damiano
9 Apr 1434DiedCardinal-Deacon of Santi Cosma e Damiano

MicroData Summary for Ardicino della Porta (Sr.):
Cardinal Ardicino della Porta (Sr.) (died ) Cardinal-Deacon of Santi Cosma e Damiano

  • a cardinal for 7.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 24 May 1426

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.5, 24 Dec 2013; data: 25 Dec 2013