Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Luigi Cardinal Del Drago

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Panisperna

Archpriest of the Basilica di Santa Maria Maggiore {Saint Mary Major Basilica}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jun 1776BornRome, Italy
30 Sep 183155.3Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
2 Jul 183256.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Panisperna
2 Jul 183256.0Elevated to Cardinal
29 Aug 183963.2AppointedArchpriest of the Basilica di Santa Maria Maggiore {Saint Mary Major Basilica}
18 Apr 184568.8DiedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Panisperna

MicroData Summary for Luigi Del Drago:
Cardinal Luigi Del Drago (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Panisperna

  • a cardinal for 13.6 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013