Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Gianpaolo Cardinal della Chiesa

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of San Pancrazio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1521BornTortona, Italy
24 Mar 156847.2Elevated to Cardinal
5 Apr 156847.2InstalledCardinal-Deacon of San Callisto
10 May 157049.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pancrazio
11 Jan 157554.0DiedCardinal-Priest of San Pancrazio

MicroData Summary for Gianpaolo della Chiesa:
Gianpaolo Cardinal della Chiesa (died ) Cardinal-Priest of San Pancrazio

  • a cardinal for 6.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 24 Mar 1568

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015