Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Mauro De Caro, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Abbot of Santissima Trinità di Cava de’ Tirreni, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Sep 1902Born
17 Jul 192724.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
21 Mar 194643.5AppointedAbbot of Santissima Trinità di Cava de’ Tirreni, Italy
18 May 195653.6DiedAbbot of Santissima Trinità di Cava de’ Tirreni, Italy

MicroData Summary for Mauro De Caro
Abbot Mauro De Caro O.S.B. (born , died ) Abbot of Santissima Trinità di Cava de’ Tirreni

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCetraro

  • a priest for 28.8 years

Source(s):
  • d: JPG

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast