Catholic-Hierarchy DC

(Layman) CÚsar de Borja

Deceased

Former Archbishop-Elect of Valencia

Titular See: (renounced holy orders)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Sep 1475³BornRoma, Italy
5 Apr 14837.5Ordained PriestPriest
12 Sep 149116.0AppointedBishop of Pamplona, Spain
31 Aug 149216.9AppointedArchbishop of Valencia, Spain
20 Sep 149318.0Elevated to Cardinal
23 Sep 149318.0AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria Nuova
4 Nov 149318.1AppointedAdministrator of Castres, France
26 Mar 149418.5Ordained DeaconDeacon
1495²19.3AppointedAdministrator of Coria, Spain
20 Jan 149519.3AppointedAdministrator of Elne, France
18 Aug 149822.9ResignedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria Nuova
6 Sep 149924.0ResignedArchbishop-Elect of Valencia, Spain
6 Sep 149924.0ResignedAdministrator of Elne, France
6 Sep 149924.0ResignedAdministrator of Coria, Spain
12 Mar 150731.5DiedFormer Archbishop-Elect of Valencia, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for CÚsar de Borja:
(Layman) CÚsar de Borja (died ) Former Archbishop-Elect of Valencia

  • a priest for 23.9 years
  • a cardinal for 4.9 years (Resigned)

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 20 Sep 1493

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015