Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro dell’Aquila

Deceased

Bishop of Trivento


Events

DateEventTitle
12 Feb 1347AppointedBishop of Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi, Italy
30 May 1348AppointedBishop of Trivento, Italy
29 Jun 1348InstalledBishop of Trivento, Italy
Nov 1361DiedBishop of Trivento, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro dell’Aquila:
Bishop Pietro dell’Aquila (died Nov 1361) Bishop of Trivento

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015