Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Niccolò delle Caselle Migliorati

Deceased

Administrator of Ravenna

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Croce in Gerusalemme


Events

DateEventTitle
15 Sep 1400AppointedArchbishop of Ravenna, Italy
11 Dec 1401Ordained BishopArchbishop of Ravenna, Italy
12 Jun 1405AppointedAdministrator of Ravenna, Italy
12 Jun 1405Elevated to Cardinal
12 Jun 1405AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Croce in Gerusalemme
16 Oct 1410DiedAdministrator of Ravenna, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Niccolò delle Caselle Migliorati:
Archbishop Giovanni Niccolò delle Caselle Migliorati (died ) Administrator of Ravenna

  • a bishop for 8.8 years
  • a cardinal for 5.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Number 16,006
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Jun 1405
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 415

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013