Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Hieroteo de la Santissima Virgen del Carmen Valbuena Alvarez, O.C.D. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Esmeraldas, Ecuador


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Oct 1898Born
9 Jul 191718.7ProfessedMember of Order of Discalced Carmelites
15 Aug 192324.8Solemn VowsMember of Order of Discalced Carmelites
29 May 192627.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Discalced Carmelites
25 Oct 194648.0AppointedPrefect of Esmeraldas, Ecuador
28 Jul 195455.8ResignedPrefect of Esmeraldas, Ecuador
19 Oct 199193.0DiedPrefect Emeritus of Esmeraldas, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for Hieroteo de la Santissima Virgen del Carmen Valbuena Alvarez
Father Hieroteo de la Santissima Virgen del Carmen Valbuena Alvarez O.C.D. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Esmeraldas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVillasur de Herreros, Spain

  • a priest for 65.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 22 Mar 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 23 Mar 2019

Quantcast