Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Juan Cardinal de Borja Lanzol de Romaní

Deceased

Administrator of Valencia

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Via Lata


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1470²BornValencia
19 Sep 149424.7AppointedBishop of Melfi, Italy
1496²26.0AppointedArchbishop of Capua, Italy
19 Feb 149626.1Elevated to Cardinal
24 Feb 149626.1InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Via Lata
15 Oct 149828.8ResignedArchbishop of Capua, Italy
3 Dec 149828.9ResignedBishop of Melfi, Italy
6 Sep 149929.7AppointedAdministrator of Valencia, Spain
17 Jan 150030.0DiedAdministrator of Valencia, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan de Borja Lanzol de Romaní:
Cardinal Juan de Borja Lanzol de Romaní (died ) Administrator of Valencia

  • a cardinal for 3.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Feb 1496

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013