Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Charles Dauvin, S.J. †

Deceased

Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Koango o Kwango

Titular Bishop of Amyzon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Aug 1910BornEnghien, Belgium
9 Dec 194838.3AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Koango o Kwango, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
9 Dec 194838.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Amyzon
28 Dec 194838.4DiedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Koango o Kwango, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Charles Dauvin:
Priest Charles Dauvin S.J. (born , died ) Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Koango o Kwango

Source(s):
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013