Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pierre Cardinal d’Aubusson, O.S.Io.Hieros. †

Deceased

Grand Master of Sovereign Military Hospitaller Order of St John of Jerusalem

Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Adriano al Foro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1423²Born
8 Jun 147047.4AppointedGrand Master of Sovereign Military Hospitaller Order of St John of Jerusalem
9 Mar 148966.1Elevated to Cardinal
23 Mar 148966.2AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Adriano al Foro
3 Jul 150380.5DiedGrand Master of Sovereign Military Hospitaller Order of St John of Jerusalem

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pierre d’Aubusson
Pierre Cardinal d’Aubusson O.S.Io.Hieros. (born 1423, died ) Grand Master of Sovereign Military Hospitaller Order of St John of Jerusalem

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMonteil-au-Vicomte

  • a cardinal for 14.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 9 Mar 1489

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast