Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guichard d’Aubusson

Deceased

Bishop of Carcassonne, France


Events

DateEventTitle
5 Nov 1460AppointedBishop of (Saint-Lizier de) Couserans (or Conserans), France
10 Mar 1475AppointedBishop of Cahors, France
15 Jul 1476AppointedBishop of Carcassonne, France
24 Nov 1497DiedBishop of Carcassonne, France

MicroData Summary for Guichard d’Aubusson
Bishop Guichard d’Aubusson (died ) Bishop of Carcassonne

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 152
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 123, and Page 118
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 134

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 12 Aug 2018

Quantcast