Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo degli Ariosti

Deceased

Bishop of Acerra, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
28 Jan 1527AppointedBishop of Acerra, Italy
21 Mar 1527Ordained BishopBishop of Acerra, Italy
23 Mar 1532DiedBishop of Acerra, Italy

Note(s): ⁷ After

MicroData Summary for Carlo degli Ariosti
Bishop Carlo degli Ariosti (died ) Bishop of Acerra

EventPlace
Ordained BishopPope's Sacristy, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 5.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 93
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1527, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 14 Jun 2018

Quantcast