Catholic-Hierarchy DC

St. Pietro Cardinal Damiano, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ostia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1007BornRavenna
14 Mar 105851.2AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia
14 Mar 105851.2Elevated to Cardinal
22 Mar 105851.2Ordained BishopCardinal-Bishop of Ostia
106053.0AppointedAdministrator of Gubbio, Italy
106659.0ResignedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia
106659.0ResignedAdministrator of Gubbio, Italy
21 Feb 107265.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Ostia

MicroData Summary for St. Pietro Damiano:
Cardinal St. Pietro Damiano O.S.B. (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ostia

  • a bishop for 13.9 years
  • a cardinal for 13.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 14 Mar 1058

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013