Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolaus d’Ambrosio

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Philomelium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Nov 1717BornCardito
17 Dec 174023.0Ordained PriestPriest
29 Mar 179072.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Philomelium

MicroData Summary for Nicolaus d’Ambrosio
Bishop Nicolaus d’Ambrosio (born ) Titular Bishop of Philomelium

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 337
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1790, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 15 Feb 2016