Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Guillaume Bernardi d’Allinges

Deceased

Abbot Emeritus of Saint-Maurice


Events

DateEventTitle
19 Jul 1463SelectedAbbot of Saint-Maurice, Switzerland
13 Sep 1463ConfirmedAbbot of Saint-Maurice, Switzerland
2 Apr 1496ResignedAbbot of Saint-Maurice, Switzerland
7 Aug 1497DiedAbbot Emeritus of Saint-Maurice, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Guillaume Bernardi d’Allinges:
Abbot Guillaume Bernardi d’Allinges (died ) Abbot Emeritus of Saint-Maurice

Source(s):
  • b: Google Books, 2015, 11, 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 27 Nov 2015