Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Luis Dalle, SS.CC. †

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator of Ayaviri, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Apr 1922Born
15 Sep 193917.3ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Sacred Hearts of Jesus and Mary
8 Dec 194523.6Perpetual VowsMember of Congregation of the Sacred Hearts of Jesus and Mary
21 Jul 194624.2Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Sacred Hearts of Jesus and Mary
30 Oct 197149.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Ayaviri, Peru
9 May 198260.0DiedApostolic Administrator of Ayaviri, Peru

MicroData Summary for Luis Dalle
Father Luis Dalle SS.CC. (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator of Ayaviri

EventPlace
Birth PlacePrinsuéjols Lozére, France

  • a priest for 35.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 4 Sep 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast