Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Vincenzo Cardinal Acquaviva d’Aragona

Deceased

Bishop of Melfi e Rapolla, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1490¹Born
7 Feb 153747.0AppointedBishop of Melfi e Rapolla, Italy
2 Jun 154252.4Elevated to Cardinal
12 Jun 154252.4InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti
16 Aug 154656.6DiedBishop of Melfi e Rapolla, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Vincenzo Acquaviva d’Aragona (VIAF: 33186082)
Giovanni Vincenzo Cardinal Acquaviva d’Aragona (born 1490, died ) Bishop of Melfi e Rapolla

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Death PlaceItri

  • a cardinal for 4.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 2 Jun 1542
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 241
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1537, Number 5*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018