Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Antonio Acquaviva d’Aragona

Deceased

Bishop of Lecce, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1489¹Born
3 Mar 151223.1AppointedBishop of Alessano, Italy
18 May 151728.3AppointedBishop of Lecce, Italy
17 May 151829.3AppointedBishop of Alessano, Italy
1521¹32.0ResignedBishop of Alessano, Italy
1525²36.0DiedBishop of Lecce, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Antonio Acquaviva d’Aragona
Bishop Giovanni Antonio Acquaviva d’Aragona (born 1489, died 1525) Bishop of Lecce

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 103, and Page 224
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1512, Number 7*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 2 Jul 2018

Quantcast