Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lukasz Jacek Czermiński

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Przemyśl, Poland

Titular Bishop of Pergamum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Aug 1662Born
1 Jul 168522.8Ordained PriestPriest
18 Mar 171552.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Przemyśl, Poland
18 Mar 171552.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Pergamum
25 Aug 171553.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pergamum
1717²54.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Przemyśl, Poland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Lukasz Jacek Czermiński
Bishop Lukasz Jacek Czermiński (born , died 1717) Auxiliary Bishop of Przemyśl

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKomientoten

  • a priest for 31.5 years
  • a bishop for 1.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 310
  • ob: CB, 2 Jan 2014
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Number 18,027
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1715, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast